DE HB76 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act extends the Office of Foreclosure Prevention and Automatic Residential Foreclosure Mediation Program an additional two years, from January 18, 2018 until January 18, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapters 198 And 200, Volume 78 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Foreclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-03-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-22 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-03-15 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback