DE HB75 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that all public bodies that are subject to the requirements of the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") respond to requests for information from persons who are not residents of Delaware. In doing so, this Act does not change the purpose of FOIA, which is to further the accountability of State government to the citizens of this State, who, as taxpayers, are funding the work of the public bodies. As such, this Act allows state agencies and public bodies to create higher fees for responses to FOIA requests from persons who are not residents of Delaware. This Act also allows persons who are not residents of Delaware to challenge the validity of an action by a public body and extends the deadline by which to do so. It clarifies that a public body can go into executive session to discuss any individual's qualifications to hold a job or pursue training, not just to discuss the qualifications of a resident of Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Colin Bonini [R] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] |
Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Tabled in Committee | |
2017-04-04 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 75 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-03-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 75 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |