DE HB75 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The continued existence and dissemination of juvenile criminal histories hampers an individual’s ability to be a successful and productive member of society. Juvenile criminal histories are a hindrance to employment, education, housing and credit. This act modifies the discretionary expungement provisions to allow more individuals the ability to petition the Court for an expungement. These changes allow the Court to consider an expungement where the individual has demonstrated rehabilitation despite multiple youthful indiscretions. These provisions will enable a greater number of deserving youth the ability to move beyond their past and recognizes that most youth mature out of offending behavior.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Court Juvenile Expungement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |