DE HB73 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is a first leg of a constitutional amendment that would eliminate from the Delaware Constitution the limitations as to when an individual may vote by absentee ballot. This amendment to the Delaware Constitution provides that the General Assembly shall enact general laws providing the circumstances, rules, and procedures for absentee voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article V Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Defeated By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2019-04-11 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2019-04-11 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 NO
2019-03-20 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2019-03-12 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback