DE HB70 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act revises the bureaus established within the Department of Correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Establishment Of Bureaus Within The Department Of Correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-23 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-03-12 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2021-03-11 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-03-04 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-01-26 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-01-14 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback