DE HB70 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill recognizes the importance of properly functioning smoke and carbon monoxide detectors in keeping tenants safe by expressly prohibiting a tenant from removing or tampering with a properly functioning detector installed in the rental unit by a landlord.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Tenant Obligations Concerning A Rental.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |