DE HB7 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes permanent and temporary changes to the Adult Correction Healthcare Review Committee ("ACHRC") which is a committee that serves in an advisory capacity to the Governor, General Assembly and the Commissioner of the Department of Correction on all matters relating to the provision of inmate health care services. The permanent changes include adding to ACHRC a healthcare professional who by virtue of the professional's training, education, and specialization hold expertise in correctional health and allowing either a psychiatrist or forensic psychologist to serve as a member.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Adult Correction Healthcare Review Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 7 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-15 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-08 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 7 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-03 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-05-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-29 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2021-04-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-04-23 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |