DE HB7 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill modifies the impact of criminal history on an applicants eligibility for licensure and thereby removes certain barriers to employment. It gives the Board the discretion to grant a waiver of a felony conviction for a crime committed against a person where more than 3 years have elapsed since the date of conviction, and for all other felonies, more than 2 years have elapsed since the date of conviction. The Board will be precluded from considering a conviction where more than 10 years have elapsed since the date of conviction, if there have been no other criminal convictions in the intervening time. The statute already prohibits licensure to anyone that has a felony sexual offense conviction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Massage And Bodywork.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 7 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |