DE HB69 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act updates the membership of the Telecommunications Relay Service Advisory Committee to include the groups currently engaged in ensuring telecommunications relay services are provided to Delawareans who need relay services.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Telecommunications Relay Service Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-09 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-04-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 69 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-03-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 69 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Telecommunication Internet & Technology) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Telecommunication Internet & Technology Committee in House |