DE HB67 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As a public school safety measure, this bill requires that any door to a classroom will be equipped with a lock that can be locked from either side of the door. Many doors are currently not capable of locking from the inside. Locking the door(s) to a classroom from inside the classroom would enable precluding a school intruder from entering that classroom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Property And Health And Safety Requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21 Stricken in House
2017-05-11 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback