DE HB66 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Section 1 of this Act provides that the statute of limitations period for a substantial underpayment of a license fee or gross receipts tax will commence at the end of the period for which the license is issued, in order to parallel the normal limitations period for the assessment of an underpayment of this type of tax. Section 2 of this Act provides that notice of a judgment must have been provided to the taxpayer not later than the date of the notice given prior to the revocation of a professional license resulting from non-payment of taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Related To Tax Administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Signed by Governor
2017-04-25 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT
2017-04-04 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-04-04 Amendment SA 1 to HB 66 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-04-04 Amendment SA 1 to HB 66 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-16 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2017-03-16 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-03-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 66 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 66 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback