DE HB65 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill enables the use of roof or ground mounted solar systems on privately owned residential dwellings by making covenants or other restrictions that effectively prohibit or unreasonably restrict the installation of solar photovoltaic systems in Delaware void and unenforceable, regardless of the date recorded. This Bill also explains that it is the policy of the State of Delaware to protect the public health, safety, and welfare by encouraging the development and use of renewable resources and to remove obstacles thereto. This Bill further provides for costs and reasonable attorneys' fees to be awarded to the prevailing party in any litigation arising under the provisions of this Section. This Bill does not render void and unenforceable reasonable restrictions on roof or ground mounted solar systems.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Solar Photovoltaic Systems And Restrictive Covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-07-01 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 3 NO | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 65 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 65 - Stricken in House | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2019-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |