DE HB64 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Mothers who give birth to monoamniotic twins are often hospitalized as early as 26 weeks into the pregnancy due to the risk of complications of having twins share a single amniotic sack. Mothers who give birth to multiples of 3 or more often have the same issue of requiring extensive medical pre-natal care. As a result, the benefits provided under the federal Family and Medical Leave Act (FMLA) are often exhausted by the time the mother and children are discharged from the hospital. This bill provides that mothers who are full time state employees may have up to six weeks of unpaid leave following the newborn(s) discharge from the hospital even if their FMLA benefits have been exhausted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-22 Amendment SA 2 to HB 64 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-22 Amendment SA 1 to HB 64 - Stricken in Senate
2017-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to HB 64 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-03-23 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-03-22 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback