DE HB61 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill will add 4 new check-off donation boxes on the Delaware personal income tax return whereby individuals may choose to donate a portion of their tax refund, or designate an amount in addition to the tax they owe that will be transferred by the Division of Revenue to one of the following organizations: Food Bank of Delaware, Sussex County Habitat for Humanity, Central Delaware Habitat for Humanity, or Habitat for Humanity of New Castle County.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Income Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-28 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2017-03-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-03-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-01-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |