DE HB6 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act codifies a juvenile's right to counsel in Family Court delinquency proceedings. The bill outlines certain circumstances where a juvenile may not waive the right to counsel: where the juvenile is accused of a felony, where the juvenile is in the custody of the Division of Family Services, where the juvenile is under the age of 16, or where the victim of the alleged delinquent act is a family member or guardian or where the family member or guardian has an interest adverse to the juvenile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Juvenile's Right To Counsel In Family Court And The Justice Of The Peace Court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Signed by Governor
2017-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-05-10 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback