DE HB58 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This act will increase the numbers of Delaware nursing students eligible for the nursing incentive program by allowing Delawareans pursuing nursing careers at non-profit hospitals located in Delaware to be eligible for the program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Nursing Incentive Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-11 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-11 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 58 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-03-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 58 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2019-02-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |