DE HB57 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This act designates rescue dogs as the official state dog.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Designation Of A State Dog.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Shupe [R] | Sen. Anthony Delcollo [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-03 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT | |
2019-03-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 57 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-03-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 57 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-02-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |