DE HB57 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act serves to clarify that work referral is an available option for fines and penalties owed as a result of a civil offense. Because the violation is civil, however, contempt of court shall not be a remedy for failure to comply with court-ordered work referral. Instead, failure to comply may result in the transfer of the judgment to the Office of State Court Collections Enforcement for collection.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Civil Traffic Offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |