DE HB56 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

This Act is the second leg of a constitutional amendment that would add the Chief Magistrate to the Court on the Judiciary. Like all judges within the state, the judges of the Justice of the Peace Court are subject to the jurisdiction of the Court on the Judiciary. This amendment makes it so that the presiding judge of each of the six state courts serves as a member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article Iv, Section 37 Of The Delaware Constitution Of 1897, As Amended, Relating To The Court On The Judiciary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10 Enact w/o Sign by Governor
2017-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-03-29 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-03-16 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2017-03-16 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-01-26 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback