DE HB56 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the Public Employment Relations Act to clarify the police officers and other law enforcement officers provided for in paragraph 9 must be certified as required by the Delaware Police Training Program. This Bill also creates a new paragraph 13 for Probation and Parole Officers of the Department of Corrections.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2009-04-07 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 0 NO 3 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-31 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-03-26 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |