DE HB55 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

In 2009, New Hampshire was the first state to develop a statewide "Gun Shop Project," reaching out to gun shops regarding the role they can play in suicide prevention. In the years since, at least 21 other states have implemented similar campaigns. This Act establishes the Delaware Gun Shop Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Gun Shop Project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2021-01-27 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-01-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 55 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-01-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 55 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2020-12-18 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback