DE HB55 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act includes the dollar amount of an Educational Support Professional of the Year award received by a State employee when determining the final average compensation used to compute the State employee's pension.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Final Average Compensation For The State Employees' Pension Plan For Recipients Of Certain Awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 15 On Its Merits | |
2019-02-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |