DE HB53 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill removes the requirement that a head or assistant head of any Division of the State Department of Justice or the Chief Prosecutor of a particular county be a resident of the State of Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Department Of Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12 Signed by Governor
2023-05-11 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO
2023-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2023-03-14 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2023-03-14 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2023-03-14 Amendment HA 1 to HB 53 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2023-03-14 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 8 YES 29 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2023-03-13 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2023-03-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 53 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2023-01-25 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2023-01-25 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2023-01-18 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback