DE HB50 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes a tax rate of 6.6% on taxable income in excess of $60,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes On Personal Income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-28HouseSigned by Governor
2013-03-28SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2013-03-27SenateReported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2013-03-26SenateAssigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2013-03-21HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2013-03-21HouseAmendment HA 2 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote
2013-03-21HouseAmendment HA 2 defeated
2013-03-21HouseAmendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote
2013-03-21HouseAmendment HA 1 defeated
2013-03-21HouseAmendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2013-03-21HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2013-03-20HouseReported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2013-03-14HouseIntroduced in House and assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2013-03-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback