DE HB50 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends the Charter for the Town of Dewey Beach to limit the height of structures within the Town. Structures existing at the time of this amendment are excluded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 59, Volume 63 Of The Laws Of Delaware, As Amended, The Charter Of The Town Of Dewey Beach To Limit The Height Of Structures Within The Town.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-13 Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2009-06-04 Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
2009-05-14 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2009-05-14 Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2009-05-14 Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
2009-04-29 Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2009-01-27 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback