DE HB5 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
If a community owner proposes a rent increase that exceeds the Consumer Price Index For All Urban Consumers in the Philadelphia-Wilmington-Atlantic City area (CPI-U), then the Delaware Manufactured Home relocation Authority is mandated to hold a final meeting between the community owner and the affected homeowners, and the homeowners association to discuss the reasons for the proposed increase. This Act allows the following to attend the final meeting: (1) the homeowners designee; (2) the homeowners attorney; (3) The attorney for the homeowners association; (4) A representative from the Delaware Manufactured Home Owners Association; and (5) Elected Delaware officials.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rent Increase Dispute Resolution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-29 | Assigned to Housing Committee in Senate | |
2021-04-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 NO | |
2021-04-29 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 5 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO | |
2021-04-01 | Reported Out of Committee (Manufactured Housing) in House with 4 Favorable | |
2021-03-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 5 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House |