DE HB5 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds the term “sexual orientation” to the already-existing list of prohibited practices of discrimination. As such, this Act would forbid discrimination against a person on the basis of sexual orientation in housing, employment, public works contracting, public accommodations, and insurance. In addition, this Act would establish that the Superior Court, in the first instance, would hear and adjudicate alleged criminal violations under the Act of equal accommodations, fair housing and employment discrimination.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 6, 9, 18, 19, 25 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Discrimination In Employment, Public Works Contracting, Housing, Equal Accommodations And The Insurance Business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Stricken | |
2010-05-05 | Administratively Returned to the House | |
2009-04-07 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2009-03-26 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 14 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-03-26 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |