DE HB488 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies that the $100 fee assessed by the Division of Public Health for plumbing permits applies solely to new construction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Plumbing Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 16 YES 22 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 defeated | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-22 | Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee | |
2010-06-22 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |