DE HB482 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act implements the recommendations of the Joint Sunset Committee that the Delaware Higher Education Commission be dissolved and its functions transferred to the Delaware Higher Education Office within the Department of Education. The bill also makes technical corrections and deletes Code provisions relating to the non-existent Engineering and Applied Science Recruitment Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Higher Education Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-23 Signed by Governor
2010-06-30 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-06-24 Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2010-06-23 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2010-06-22 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2010-06-15 Introduced in House and assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee
2010-06-15 Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback