DE HB480 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation implements DNREC’s reorganization by separating the current Division of Air and Waste Management into the Division of Waste Management and Division of Air Quality; changes the name of the Division of Soil and Water Conservation to the Division of Watershed Stewardship; changes the name of the Division of Water Resources to the Division of Water and authorizes the Secretary to create an Office of Environmental Protection to include the Divisions of Waste Management, Air Quality and Water and an Office of Natural Resources to include the Divisions of Watershed Stewardship, Division of Parks and Recreation and Division of Fish and Wildlife.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 3, 7, And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Natural Resources And Environmental Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable | |
2010-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |