DE HB48 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes a Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program for new primary care providers to be administered by the Delaware Health Care Commission. Under the loan repayment program, the Health Care Commission may award education loan repayment grants to new primary care providers of up to $50,000 per year for a maximum of 4 years. Priority consideration may be given to DIMER-participating students and participants in Delaware based residency programs. Sites eligible to apply for grants on behalf of their new primary care providers must be located in underserved areas or areas of need and must accept Medicare and Medicaid participants. Grants to hospital sites must be matched on a dollar-for-dollar basis by the applicant hospital and the disbursement of grants from the program is contingent upon an initial, one-time contribution to the Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program, in an amount Fiscal Year 21 appropriation of State funds up to a maximum of $1 million, from Delaware health insurers. This Act also provides that the Delaware Healthcare Commission may award Health Care Provider Repayment grants on a prorated annual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Care Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-10 Signed by Governor
2021-06-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-23 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-22 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2021-06-17 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-06-10 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2021-06-10 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-06-10 Amendment HA 1 to HB 48 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-04 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-03-11 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2021-01-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 48 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-01-07 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback