DE HB48 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A dealer plate entitles its owner to operate on the highways a vehicle that is not individually registered, provided that the vehicle is operated for certain specified purposes, such as testing or demonstrating the vehicle. Under current law, the number of dealer plates obtainable by motor vehicle dealers is tied to the number of vehicles sold per year, except that dealers that sell more than 100 vehicles per year may obtain, at the dealer’s discretion, any number of dealer plates. Although there may be sound reasons for allowing an unlimited number of dealer plates for retail dealers (who use them for test drives and similar purposes), those reasons do not apply with equal force for wholesale dealers – i.e., dealers who only sell to other dealers and not to retail customers. To reduce the potential for misuse of such plates, this bill would limit to five (5) the maximum number of plates a wholesale dealer may obtain.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. William Outten [R] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-04-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |