DE HB479 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the civil penalty for violating the parking regulations in ยง 4180 from not less than $10 nor more than $25 to not less than $100 nor more than $500. This Act also increases the minimum fine for violating the requirements of Chapter 41 relating to size or weight of a vehicle or a combination of vehicles or restrictions regarding parking in residence districts from not less than $28.75 nor more than $230 for a first offense to not less than $100 and not more than $500 for a first offense. For a subsequent offense the penalty is increased from to not less than $115 nor more than $575 to not less than $400 and not more than $2,000.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-21 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO | |
2022-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |