DE HB476 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act empowers each county to create regulations for the maintenance of for-profit cemeteries and to impose penalties upon those who do not abide by the maintenance regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Maintenance Of For-profit Cemeteries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-21 Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback