DE HB474 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act includes Probation and Parole Officers in the Department of Services for Children, Youth and their Families under the definitions of Law-Enforcement Officer under the Law-Enforcement Officers Bill of Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Law-enforcement Officers Bill Of Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback