DE HB465 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

In January 2018, the Code Revisors provided the General Assembly with a list of potential technical corrections that they identified as they revised the Delaware Code to reflect legislation that was enacted by the 149th General Assembly in 2017 or as they reviewed titles of the Code. While technical in nature, these changes are beyond the authority of the Code Revisors to make and can only be done by the General Assembly through legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6, Title 7, Title 8, Title 10, Title 11, Title 14, Title 16, Title 24, Title 29, And Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Technical Corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04 Signed by Governor
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-27 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-21 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 465 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 465 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-14 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback