DE HB462 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides for mandatory fines, which may not be suspended, for the violation of motor vehicle insurance laws in 21 Del.C. 2118, and for the unlawful possession, manufacture, sale, distribution, or circulation of fictitious insurance ID cards or any fictitious proof of insurance in 21 Del.C. 2118A.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Penalties For Violations Of Required Motor Vehicle Insurance, Including Fictitious Proofs Of Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-22 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |