DE HB46 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently the Delaware Code does not permit alcoholic beverage license holders to brew hard seltzers or other non-malt based products that they are otherwise allowed to brew as a result of obtaining a Federal Brewers Notice. This Act permits Delaware brewery-pub and microbrewery license holders to brew, bottle and sell hard seltzers and other fermented beverages made from malt substitutes and includes specific tax on fermented beverages. The language of the Act also mirrors the federal definition of a malt-substitute product.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-01-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-01-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-27 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2021-01-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-01-26 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-01-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 8 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2020-12-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |