DE HB449 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill merely makes a technical change by indicating that Sussex County Planning & Zoning Commission appointments are based on county council districts rather than representative districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Planning & Zoning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-27 Signed by Governor
2010-06-30 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-06-23 Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2010-06-17 Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
2010-06-10 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2010-06-08 Re-Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2010-06-08 Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback