DE HB447 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act implements some of the recommendations of the African American Task Force's Safety and Justice Subcommittee. Specifically, it requires that cases or charges that are more than 7 years old be treated as resolved in favor of a child or adult if there is no disposition available for the case and no outstanding warrants. This clarification will prevent errors in record-keeping in the criminal justice system from stopping an otherwise qualified petitioner from obtaining an expungement that may otherwise be available. It will also require old cases for which no outcome is listed to be removed from a person's record if they are more than 7 years old.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Expungement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-29 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-21 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-21 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 447 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 447 - Stricken in House | |
2022-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 447 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |