DE HB447 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill would permit the sale of beer made on the premises to consumers for consumption on the premises similar to that currently permitted under Delaware law for Farm Wineries. This will encourage tourism at the Microbreweries licensed in this State. Delaware law has permitted an individual to have an interest in up to two (2) Brewery-Pubs and a Microbrewery, but a strict reading of 546 would mean that the individual could only sell for consumption off of the premises at two of the three licensed premises. This Bill makes clear that the provisions of 546, limiting to two (2) the number of establishments that sell for off premises consumption that an individual can have an interest in, does not apply to microbreweries and Brewery-Pubs. Brewery-Pubs are limited in the amount of production and may only sell beer produced at the premises, therefore the public policy set forth in 546 does not apply in this instance. Federal law has provided a tax break for what has been referred to as “Craft Breweries.” The maximum that a brewery can manufacture and receive the reduced rate is currently two million barrels. This Bill would allow microbreweries to brew up to the level that the Federal Government recognizes as a Craft Brewery which could attract larger microbreweries to Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Brewery-pubs And Microbreweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (SMALL BUSINESS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Assigned to Small Business Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-10 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-10 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-10 | Lifted From Table in House | |
2010-06-10 | Laid On Table in House | |
2010-06-10 | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-09 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-06-03 | Introduced in House and assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee | |
2010-06-03 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |