DE HB444 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Amendment HA 1 to HB 444 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of this Act allows those licensed as importers to pay tax upon the sale of alcoholic beverages to customers, instead of the tax being due when the alcoholic beverages come to rest in the State of Delaware. Section 2 of this Act provides that if any of the provisions are found to be unconstitutional, the remaining provisions will stand. Section 3 of this Act provides that the legislation will be effective as of August 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Related To Collection Of Tax On Alcoholic Beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 444 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-14 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Re-Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
2018-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback