DE HB442 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act expands the Juvenile Civil Citation Program to provide law enforcement officers with the discretion to refer any first-time juvenile offender engaged in any misdemeanor-level behavior to the civil citation program, where the juvenile can be required to participate in counseling, treatment, community service, or any other appropriate intervention. A juvenile who successfully completes the requirements of the civil citation program will not have an arrest or prosecution indicated on their record. Under the current law, officers may make referrals to the civil citation program for only very limited types of misdemeanor offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Juvenile Civil Citation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-28 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-21 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 442 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 442 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2018-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback