DE HB441 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires scrap metal processors to upload the VIN into the NMVTIS by the end of the next business day and to have the vehicle cleared by the State Police auto theft technician before scrapping, dismantling, or altering the vehicle. This Act also removes the requirement that a salvage dealer or junk dealer certify to DelDOT within 30 days of buying a totaled vehicle for scrap.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Scrap Processors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-06-28 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2016-06-22 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |