DE HB440 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

House Substitute No. 1 for House Bill 440 differs from House Bill 440 only in that it locates the Overdose System of Care and the Overdose System of Care Committee in Chapter 97 of Title 16 instead of in Chapter 10 of Title 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation Of An Overdose System Of Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-06-12 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 440, and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback