DE HB44 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act reflects the National Association of Insurance Commissioners revisions to the Model Credit for Reinsurance Act. The revisions make the law consistent with provisions of covered agreements with the European Union and United Kingdom with respect to reinsurance collateral requirements. The changes will also provide reinsurers domiciled in National Association of Insurance Commissioners-qualified jurisdictions other than within the EU (currently, Bermuda, Japan and Switzerland) with the possibility of similar reinsurance collateral reductions. This is an accreditation bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Credit For Reinsurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30 Signed by Governor
2021-06-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-04-21 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2021-03-18 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2021-03-18 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-03-12 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-01-14 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 6 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2020-12-18 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback