DE HB44 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill eliminates all references to physical paper copies of professional licenses for professions administrated by the Division of Professional Regulation. This bill would eliminate the need for the Division to print and mail over 80,000 paper licenses every two years thus cutting down on administrative and supply costs and eliminating unnecessary paper production and waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Professions And Occupations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09 Signed by Governor
2019-03-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-03-13 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-03-05 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2019-03-05 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-03-05 Amendment HA 1 to HB 44 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-01-23 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2019-01-17 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback