DE HB44 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates a tax check-off for Delaware taxpayers to designate contributions to the White Clay Creek Wild and Scenic River Preservation Fund, which is created by this Act to enhance water resource restoration and management programs within the White Clay Creek watershed, Delaware’s only federally designated wild and scenic river.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Income Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-07 Signed by Governor
2011-06-01 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-05-12 Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & TAXATION) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2011-04-12 Assigned to Revenue & Taxation Committee in Senate
2011-04-05 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2011-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2011-03-10 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback