DE HB44 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the State Fire Prevention Commission to incorporate a non-profit, non-stock corporation for the purpose of establishing, administering and operating an overnight camp devoted to helping young people who have suffered severe burns deal with the physical and emotional issues arising from such injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Permitting The Delaware State Fire Prevention Commission To Establish A Delaware Burn Camp To Help Young People Who Have Suffered Burns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-30 Signed by Governor
2009-04-08 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2009-04-07 Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2009-03-19 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2009-01-29 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2009-01-29 Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2009-01-28 Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 Favorable
2009-01-28 Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2009-01-21 Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee
2009-01-21 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback