DE HB439 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee's ("JLOSC") review of the Water Infrastructure Advisory Council ("WIAC"). This Act clarifies quorum, removes a prohibition against WIAC members voting when attending a meeting virtually, and authorizes WIAC to adopt procedural rules to carry out its functions. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Relating To The Water Infrastructure Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-21 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |